US HB1862 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-22 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans' Credit Protection Act Directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to: (1) conduct outreach to inform veterans of how to resolve credit issues caused by a delayed payment of a claim for emergency hospital care, medical services, or other emergency health care furnished through a non-VA provider; and (2) establish a toll-free telephone number for veterans to report such issues to the Chief Business Office of the VA. Requires the VA to report annually on the effectiveness of such Office in providing timely payment of proper invoices for emergency hospital care, medical services, or other emergency health care furnished through non-VA providers by the required payment date during both the preceding five-year period and the preceding one-year period. Requires the report, for any part of the period covered by such a report that occurred before October 1, 2014, to evaluate the provision of such payments by the Veterans Integrated Service Networks. Requires such report to include: the number of veterans who contacted the VA regarding delayed payments that could negatively affect their credit; the total amount of interest penalties paid by the VA by reason of delayed payments; the number of proper invoices submitted, the amount owed for and the payment status of such invoices, and the periods that elapsed before such invoices were paid; any comments regarding delayed payments made by medical providers; and a description of the best practices to provide timely payment of a proper invoice, including a plan to improve such timely payments. Directs: (1) the Office to submit to Congress quarterly reports on the number of pending claims for reimbursement for emergency hospital care, medical services, and other emergency health care furnished through non-VA providers; and (2) the Comptroller General to conduct a study that evaluates the effectiveness of the Office in providing timely payment of a proper invoice for such care by the required payment date.
Title
Veterans' Credit Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-22 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-14 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3016 (Related) 2016-02-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hospital care
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Consumer credit
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Hospital care
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1862/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1862/BILLS-114hr1862ih.pdf |