US HB1800 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-14 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to transfer certain Federal land to facilitate scientific research supporting Federal space and defense programs. This bill directs the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to convey to the Utah State University Research Foundation, without consideration, a specified parcel of real property, including improvements, located outside the boundaries of the Wasatch-Cache National Forest in Rich County, Utah, for the purpose of permitting the foundation to use the property for scientific and educational purposes. Conveyed property not being used in accordance with the purposes of the conveyance shall revert to and become the property of the United States, and the federal government shall have the right of immediate entry onto it. USDA shall require the foundation to cover the costs (except any costs for environmental remediation of the property) incurred by USDA, or to reimburse USDA for the actual costs incurred, to carry out such conveyance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To direct the Secretary of Agriculture to transfer certain Federal land to facilitate scientific research supporting Federal space and defense programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-14SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
2018-03-13HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-03-13HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1516)
2018-03-13HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1800.
2018-03-13HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1516-1517)
2018-03-13HouseMr. Curtis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2017-12-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 327.
2017-12-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-442.
2017-11-08HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
2017-11-08HouseSubcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged.
2017-11-08HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-11-07HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-04-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
2017-03-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2017-03-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2810 (Related) 2017-12-12 - Became Public Law No: 115-91. (TXT | PDF)
HR616 (Similar To) 2017-11-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB5515 (Related) 2018-07-11 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback