US HB1722 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-26 - Became Public Law No: 118-32.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Grand Ronde Reservation Act, and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grand Ronde Reservation Act Amendment of 2023

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-26HouseBecame Public Law No: 118-32.
2023-12-26HouseSigned by President.
2023-12-26HousePresented to President.
2023-12-20SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2023-12-19SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6061-6062)
2023-11-13SenateReceived in the Senate, read twice.
2023-11-08HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2023-11-08HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
2023-11-08HouseConsidered as unfinished business.
2023-11-06HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Westerman objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn.
2023-11-06HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1722.
2023-11-06HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
2023-11-06HouseMr. Westerman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2023-11-03HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 214.
2023-11-03HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-265.
2023-07-26HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 0.
2023-07-26HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2023-07-26HouseSubcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs Discharged.
2023-06-07HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2023-04-14HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Indian and Insular Affairs .
2023-03-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2023-03-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB910 (Related) 2023-11-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 251.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback