US HB1688 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - An errata sheet on written report No. 117-63 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-02 - An errata sheet on written report No. 117-63 was printed.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Indian Child Protection and Family Violence Prevention Act.
Title
Native American Child Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | Senate | An errata sheet on written report No. 117-63 was printed. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 259. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Schatz without amendment. With written report No. 117-63. |
2021-10-27 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Committee on Indian Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-71. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2021-05-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2222-2223) |
2021-05-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1688. |
2021-05-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2222-2224) |
2021-05-12 | House | Mr. Soto moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2326 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.