US HB1669 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to make permanent the high technology pilot program of the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VET–TEC Authorization Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Juan Ciscomani [R-AZ] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Derrick Van Orden [R-WI] |
Rep. Jerry Carl [R-AL] | Rep. Greg Murphy [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 235 (Y: 409 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-05-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-05-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 9 (Roll no. 235). |
2023-05-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-05-22 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-05-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1669. |
2023-05-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-05-22 | House | Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 48. |
2023-05-17 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 118-68. |
2023-04-28 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2023-04-28 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-28 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Discharged. |
2023-04-18 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB234 (Related) 2023-04-19 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB746 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB1635 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB1798 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
SB1330 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1678 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1877 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB746 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB1635 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
HB1798 (Related) 2023-04-18 - Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
SB1330 (Related) 2023-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1678 (Related) 2023-05-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB1877 (Related) 2023-06-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.