US HB1660 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill directs the Administrator of the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to report to Congress, annually for four years, on the development and use of global health innovations in USAID programs, projects, and activities. Such reports shall include descriptions of: (1) goals and progress towards their achievement; (2) how innovation has advanced USAID's commitments to achieving an HIV/AIDS-free generation, ending preventable child and maternal deaths, and protecting communities from infectious diseases; (3) how USAID, alone and in partnerships, is leveraging U.S. investments to achieve greater health innovation; and (4) coordination with other federal departments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Global Health Innovation Act of 2017

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-18 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 34 (Y: 423 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 364.
2018-03-22SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report.
2018-03-20SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
2018-01-19SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2018-01-18HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-01-18HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 423 - 3 (Roll no. 34). (text: CR 1/17/2018 H439)
2018-01-18HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H538-539)
2018-01-17HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2018-01-17HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1660.
2018-01-17HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H439-440)
2018-01-17HouseMr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-09-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-09-28HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-03-21HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback