US HB1647 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 682.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 682.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To redesignate the Salem Maritime National Historic Site as the "Salem Maritime National Historical Park", and for the purposes.
Title
Salem Maritime National Historical Park Redesignation and Boundary Study Act
Sponsors
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 682. |
2024-12-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-835. |
2024-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged |
2024-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-17 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB961 (Related) 2024-12-19 - Held at the desk.