US HB1635 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Charlotte's Web Medical Access Act of 2015 Amends the Controlled Substances Act (CSA) to exclude cannabidiol and cannabidiol-rich plants: (1) from the definition of "marihuana," and (2) from treatment as a controlled substance under such Act. Defines: (1) "cannabidiol-rich plant" to mean the plant Cannabis sativa L. and any part of such plant with a delta-9 tetrahydrocannabinol concentration of not more than 0.3% on a dry weight basis; and (2) "cannabidiol" to mean the substance cannabidiol, as derived from a cannabidiol-rich plant. Exempts cannabidiol or cannabidiol-rich plants from the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act. Declares that nothing in this Act shall restrict any activities related to the use, production, or distribution of marihuana in a state in which such activities are legal under state law. Terminates this Act three years after its enactment.
Title
Charlotte's Web Medical Access Act of 2015
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2015-03-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB525 (Related) 2015-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB1333 (Related) 2015-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB1333 (Related) 2015-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Horticulture and plants
State and local government operations
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Horticulture and plants
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1635/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1635/BILLS-114hr1635ih.pdf |