US HB1634 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-28 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) Amends the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to require the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to: (1) ensure that each border security technology acquisition program that is determined to be a major acquisition program has an acquisition program baseline approved by the relevant acquisition decision authority; (2) document that each such program is meeting the cost, schedule, and performance thresholds specified in such baseline in compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation; and (3) have a plan for each such program to meet program implementation objectives by managing contractor performance. Directs: (1) the Under Secretary for Management and the Commissioner of U.S. Customs and Border Protection to ensure that border security technology acquisition program managers adhere to relevant internal control standards identified by the Comptroller General, and (2) the Commissioner to provide information to assist the Under Secretary in monitoring proper program management of such acquisition programs. Requires the Under Secretary for Management, in coordination with the Under Secretary for Science and Technology and the Commissioner, to submit a plan for testing and evaluation, as well as the use of independent verification and validation resources, for border security technology so that new border security technologies are evaluated through a series of assessments, processes, and audits to ensure compliance with relevant departmental acquisition policies and the Federal Acquisition Regulation, as well as the effectiveness of taxpayer dollars. Defines "major acquisition program" to mean a DHS acquisition program that is estimated by DHS to require an eventual total expenditure of at least $300 million over its life cycle cost.
Title
Border Security Technology Accountability Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX] | Rep. John Katko [R-NY] | Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX] |
Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Russell [R-OK] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Candice Miller [R-MI] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2015-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5494) |
2015-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1634. |
2015-07-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5494-5495) |
2015-07-27 | House | Ms. McSally moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-07-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 171. |
2015-07-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 114-226. |
2015-06-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-06-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2015-03-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2015-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1873 (Same As) 2016-04-04 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 406.
Subjects
Border security and unlawful immigration
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Immigration
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment
Congressional oversight
Government information and archives
Immigration
Public contracts and procurement
Technology assessment