US HB1617 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Office of the Director of National Intelligence (ODNI) to provide Congress with assessments of the current intentions of Russia and its leaders. Specifically, the ODNI shall assess (1) the potential for Russian military action against North Atlantic Treaty Organization (NATO) countries, (2) possible Russian responses to an increased U.S. or NATO military presence in Eastern Europe, and (3) areas where Russia could exploit weaknesses and divisions among the governments of its Western adversaries.
Title
KREMLIN Act Keeping Russian Entrapments Minimal and Limiting Intelligence Networks Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 40. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-03-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-03-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2664-2665) |
2019-03-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1617. |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2664-2665) |
2019-03-12 | House | Mr. Krishnamoorthi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Alliances
Armed forces and national security
Canada
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Estonia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Georgia
Germany
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Latvia
Lithuania
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Poland
Russia
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Ukraine
United Kingdom
Armed forces and national security
Canada
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Estonia
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Georgia
Germany
Government studies and investigations
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International organizations and cooperation
Latvia
Lithuania
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Poland
Russia
Sanctions
Subversive activities
Ukraine
United Kingdom