US HB1603 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To repeal provisions of Public Law 117-169 relating to taxpayer subsidies for home electrification, and for other purposes.
Title
Homeowner Energy Freedom Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 19. |
2023-03-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-31. |
2023-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 22. |
2023-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security. |
2023-03-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-03-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2023-03-30 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 1.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB2806 (Related) 2023-09-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB947 (Related) 2023-03-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2811 (Related) 2023-05-04 - Committee on the Budget. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 118-76.
SB2806 (Related) 2023-09-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.