US HB1590 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Integrated Electronic Health Records (iEHR) for Military and Veterans Act Integrated Electronic Health Records (iEHR) for Military and Veterans Act - Directs the Secretaries of Defense (DOD) and Veterans Affairs (VA) to jointly carry out a program to award a cash prize ($50 million) and contract to an entity that develops a fully-integrated electronic health records program for national use by DOD and VA. Directs the Secretaries to: (1) widely advertise the prize competitions and announce each one in the Federal Register, and (2) create a joint panel to establish criteria for the program's development. Requires the prize recipient to be awarded a contract with DOD and VA to provide the program, including maintenance and support, and to be compensated at $25 million per year for five years. Reverts to the federal government, after such period, any intellectual property developed under the contract. Authorizes the Secretaries to require competition participants to waive claims against the federal government (except for willful conduct) arising from such participation. Requires participants to obtain liability insurance.
Title
Integrated Electronic Health Records (iEHR) for Military and Veterans Act
Sponsors
Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2015-06-11 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Department of Defense
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Intellectual property
Military medicine
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Computers and information technology
Department of Defense
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Intellectual property
Military medicine
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Public contracts and procurement
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1590/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1590/BILLS-114hr1590ih.pdf |