US HB1580 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farmer Flexibility Act This bill extends the final planting date established by the Risk Management Agency for certain federal crop insurance policies covering grain sorghum. To account for extreme weather conditions, the final planting date for policies with an existing date of April 5, 2015, is extended to April 26, 2015.
Title
Farmer Flexibility Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management. |
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2015-03-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1580/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1580/BILLS-114hr1580ih.pdf |