US HB1580 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-21-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Beneficiary Preservation of Choice Act of 2011 - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act, as amended by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to repeal the allowance for disenrollment, between January 1 and March 15 of each year, only from an MedicareAdvantage plan to elect enrollment in the original Medicare fee-for-service program. Restores the option under previous law to elect to change from a MedicareAdvantage to the original Medicare fee-for-service plan, or from the original Medicare fee-for-service to a MedicareAdvantage plan, once a year during the first three months.
Title
Medicare Beneficiary Preservation of Choice Act of 2011
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1479 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1580/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1580/BILLS-112hr1580ih.pdf |