US HB1572 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-7)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Bureau of Land Management (BLM), the U.S. Geological Survey, the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the National Park Service, and other appropriate entities to support a program of intramural and extramural botanical science research to support the land management responsibilities of the Department of the Interior. Interior may hire additional personnel to augment its expertise in the botanical sciences. Interior's land management agencies and the Forest Service shall give preference to using locally adapted native plant materials when undertaking land management activities on lands under their respective jurisdictions. Specified federal agencies shall collaborate regarding land use responsibility when undertaking specified activities, including the development of genetically appropriate seed, related to native plant materials. The bill authorizes the BLM to undertake specified activities for the development and use of native plant materials, including the protection of rare plants on public lands. The National Fish and Wildlife Foundation shall ensure that a program of activities which is focused on conservation and protection of native plants is incorporated into its existing programs and activities.
Title
Botanical Sciences and Native Plant Materials Research, Restoration, and Promotion Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-18 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2384 (Related) 2019-07-31 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Animal and plant health
Biological and life sciences
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Genetics
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Horticulture and plants
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Biological and life sciences
Congressional oversight
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Fires
Forests, forestry, trees
Genetics
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Higher education
Horticulture and plants
Land use and conservation
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Research administration and funding
Student aid and college costs
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1572/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1572/BILLS-116hr1572ih.pdf |