US HB155 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 67-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Hearing Protection Act This bill removes silencers from the definition of firearms for purposes of the National Firearms Act. It also treats persons acquiring or possessing a firearm silencer as meeting any registration and licensing requirements of such Act. The Department of Justice must destroy certain records relating to the registration, transfer, or making of a silencer. The bill also revises the definition of firearm silencer and firearm muffler under the federal criminal code and includes such items in the 10% excise tax category.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hearing Protection Act

Sponsors

Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA]
Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC]
Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ]Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH]
Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT]Rep. James Comer [R-KY]
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY]
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]Rep. Ken Buck [R-CO]
Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA]
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ]Rep. David Kustoff [R-TN]
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Frank Lucas [R-OK]Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL]
Rep. French Hill [R-AR]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]Rep. Michael Cloud [R-TX]Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]
Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE]Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY]Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN]Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA]
Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL]Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Russ Fulcher [R-ID]
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA]Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL]Rep. John Carter [R-TX]
Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]Rep. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB817 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB775 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB202 (Related) 2019-01-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback