US HB155 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-7)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-13 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E69)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-13 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E69)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Suspension of Federal Income Tax on Unemployment Benefits Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to suspend, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2008, and before January 1, 2011, the taxation of unemployment compensation.
Title
Suspension of Federal Income Tax on Unemployment Benefits Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-13 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E69) | |
2009-01-06 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4718 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
SB155 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S138)
SB155 (Related) 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S138)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/155/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr155/BILLS-111hr155ih.pdf |