US SB155 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S138)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment Benefit Tax Suspension Act of 2009 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to suspend, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2007, and before January 1, 2010, the taxation of unemployment compensation.
Title
Unemployment Benefit Tax Suspension Act of 2009
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Bunning [R-KY] | Sen. Blanche Lincoln [D-AR] | Sen. Olympia Snowe [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-06 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S138) | |
2009-01-06 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S138) |
Same As/Similar To
HB155 (Related) 2009-01-13 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E69)
HB4718 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
HB4718 (Related) 2010-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Income Security and Family Support.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-bill/155/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/s155/BILLS-111s155is.pdf |