US HB1546 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency Information Improvement Act of 2015 Amends the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to include public broadcasting facilities within the definition of a "private nonprofit facility" that provides essential services of a governmental nature to the general public, and to include broadcast and telecommunications within the definition of "critical services" provided by such a facility, for purposes of eligibility for certain disaster assistance. Makes this Act applicable to a major disaster declared by the President under such Act on or after October 28, 2012.
Title
Emergency Information Improvement Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY] |
Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] |
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1471 (Related) 2016-03-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1090 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-111. (TXT | PDF)
SB1090 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-111. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Broadcasting, cable, digital technologies
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
News media and reporting
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
News media and reporting
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1546/BILLS-114hr1546ih.pdf |