US HB1532 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Pending: Senate Indian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Poarch Band of Creek Indians Land Reaffirmation Act (Sec. 2) This bill reaffirms the trust status of 389.5 acres of land taken into trust by the United States for the benefit of the Poarch Band of Creek Indians. The land is located in Escambia County, Florida, and Monroe, Escambia, and Montgomery Counties in Alabama.
Title
Poarch Band of Creek Indians Land Reaffirmation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] |
Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs. |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H392-393) |
2018-01-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1532. |
2018-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H392-394) |
2018-01-16 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 383. |
2018-01-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-513. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced in House |