US HB1525 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Department of Interior and the Department of Agriculture to establish an online portal to accept, process, and dispose of an application for the placement of communications facilities on certain Federal lands.
Title
DIGITAL Applications Act Deploying Infrastructure with Greater Internet Transactions And Legacy Applications Act
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3370 (Related) 2021-07-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1525/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1525/BILLS-117hr1525ih.pdf |