US HB1512 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Social Security Child Protection Act of 2018
Title
Social Security Child Protection Act of 2018
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Devin Nunes [R-CA] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Jeb Hensarling [R-TX] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2018-04-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-04-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3375) |
2018-04-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1512. |
2018-04-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3375-3377) |
2018-04-17 | House | Mr. Marchant moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 486. |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 115-635. |
2018-04-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-04-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-03-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Child safety and welfare
Computer security and identity theft
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Computer security and identity theft
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare