US HB150 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-103. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-103. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the establishment and use of data standards for information reported by recipients of federal grants. The bill requires the Office of Management and Budget, jointly with the executive department that issues the most federal grant awards, to (1) establish government-wide data standards for information reported by grant recipients, (2) issue guidance directing federal agencies to apply those standards, and (3) require the publication of recipient-reported data collected from all agencies on a single public website. Each agency shall ensure its awards use the data standards for future information collection requests.
Title
GREAT Act Grant Reporting Efficiency and Agreements Transparency Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] | Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Scott DesJarlais [R-TN] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC] | Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA] |
Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 41 (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-30 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-103. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-30 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-16 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H10295-10297) |
2019-12-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 150. |
2019-12-16 | House | Mr. Gomez moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H10295-10298) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5927-5928) |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 200. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-96. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 41). |
2019-01-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H688-689) |
2019-01-15 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 150. |
2019-01-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H569-572; text: CR H569-571) |
2019-01-15 | House | Mr. Cummings moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB50 (Same As) 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SB1829 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB1829 (Related) 2019-06-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Government trust funds
Office of Management and Budget (OMB)