US HB1488 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 2 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana Dunes National Park Act (Sec. 2) This bill renames the Indiana Dunes National Lakeshore as the Indiana Dunes National Park. (Sec. 3) The bill redesignates the 1.6 mile Miller-Woods Trail within the park as the Paul H. Douglas Trail.
Title
Indiana Dunes National Park Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] |
Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2017-11-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8325) |
2017-11-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1488. |
2017-11-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8325-8326) |
2017-11-01 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-10-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 254. |
2017-10-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-350. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB599 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Great Lakes
Indiana
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores
Indiana
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Seashores and lakeshores