US HB1485 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide additional funds for Federal and State facility energy resiliency programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Open Back Better Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB531 (Same As) 2021-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
HB1512 (Related) 2022-06-30 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1848 (Related) 2022-01-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1485/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1485/BILLS-117hr1485ih.pdf |