US HB1460 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit voter caging and other questionable challenges.
Title
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit voter caging and other questionable challenges.
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1275 (Related) 2019-03-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
SB549 (Related) 2019-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
Subjects
Congressional elections
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government information and archives
Postal service
State and local government operations
Voting rights
Crime and law enforcement
Crime prevention
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government information and archives
Postal service
State and local government operations
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1460/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1460/BILLS-116hr1460ih.pdf |