US HB1437 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coquille Forest Fairness Act Amends the Coquille Restoration Act to require the Department of the Interior to manage the Coquille Forest in accordance with the laws pertaining to the management of Indian trust land. (Currently, Interior is also required to manage the Forest under applicable state and federal forestry and environmental protection laws, and subject to critical habitat designations under the Endangered Species Act and the standards and guidelines of federal forest plans on adjacent or nearby federal lands.) Continues to apply: (1) federal law relating to the export of unprocessed logs harvested from federal land to any unprocessed logs that are harvested from the Forest, and (2) competitive bidding requirements to sales of timber from the Forest. Removes a provision: (1) giving the U.S. District Court for the District of Oregon jurisdiction over certain actions concerning the placement of lands in Coos County and Curry County, Oregon, into trust for the Coquille Tribe and the management of the Coquille Forest; and (2) limiting available remedies to equitable relief, unless otherwise provided for by law.
Title
Coquille Forest Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB816 (Related) 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1664; text of measure as introduced: CR S1665-1666)
HB2791 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
SB132 (Related) 2015-07-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
HB2791 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
SB132 (Related) 2015-07-16 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Oregon
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1437/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1437/BILLS-114hr1437ih.pdf |