US HB2791 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-17 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act TITLE III--OREGON COASTAL LANDS Oregon Coastal Lands Act (Sec. 303) This bill requires that 14,408 acres of land be held in trust for, and be part of the reservation of, the Confederated Tribes of Coos, Lower Umpqua, and Siuslaw Indians. (Sec. 305) Federal law applies to the export of unprocessed logs harvested from this land and to forest management on this land. Gaming on this land is prohibited. (Sec. 306) Interior must reclassify public domain land as Oregon and California Railroad grant land in equal acreage as grant land held in trust as part of this land.
Title
Western Oregon Tribal Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2015-09-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6000-6001) |
2015-09-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2791. |
2015-09-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6000-6002) |
2015-09-16 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2015-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 193. |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-254. |
2015-07-09 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2015-07-09 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-07-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2015-07-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1437 (Related) 2015-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs.
SB816 (Related) 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1664; text of measure as introduced: CR S1665-1666)
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB816 (Related) 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S1664; text of measure as introduced: CR S1665-1666)
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Federal district courts
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon
Federal district courts
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Gambling
Indian claims
Indian lands and resources rights
Jurisdiction and venue
Land transfers
Native Americans
Oregon