US HB1425 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-398, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-398, Part I.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Marine Debris Emergency Act of 2013 - Amends the Marine Debris Act to: (1) require the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) to approve or disapprove a grant application with respect to a severe marine debris event and provide grant funds to an approved applicant within 60 days after receipt of the grant application, and (2) authorize the Administrator to give preference under the Marine Debris Program to projects that address such an event. Authorizes state governors to request that the Administrator declare a severe marine debris event for purposes of grant consideration and disbursement. Requires the Administrator, within 30 days after receiving such request, to either declare such an event or provide a response explaining why the declaration was not made. Allows the Administrator to: (1) require a grant recipient to provide training to persons engaged in grant-funded marine debris response efforts on the potential impacts of marine debris, including nonindigenous species related to the debris, on the economy, the marine environment, and navigation safety; and (2) enter into agreements to use the personnel, services, equipment, or facilities of federal agencies, state and local governments, regional agencies, interstate agencies, and other entities on a reimbursable or nonreimbursable basis. Defines "nonindigenous species" to mean any species or other viable biological material that enters an ecosystem beyond its historic range, including any such organism transferred from one country into another.
Title
Marine Debris Emergency Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] |
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] |
Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 113-398, Part I. |
2013-12-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-12-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-12-04 | House | Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs Discharged. |
2013-06-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Fisheries, Wildlife, Oceans, and Insular Affairs. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Aquatic ecology
Department of Commerce
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pest management
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
Aquatic ecology
Department of Commerce
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Pest management
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation and public works
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1425/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1425/BILLS-113hr1425ih.pdf |