US HB1416 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 87-37)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cancer Patient Protection Act of 2013 - Declares that, notwithstanding the presidential sequestration order issued on March 1, 2013, the budgetary resources sequestered for payments for drugs and biologicals under title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act shall be available for obligation for drugs and biologicals furnished on or after enactment of this Act in the same amount and manner as if such order had not been issued. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to make any payments under Medicare part B (Supplementary Medical Insurance) that may be required to reimburse for reductions in payments made under the sequestration order for drugs and biologicals furnished on or after April 1, 2013, and before enactment of this Act.
Title
Cancer Patient Protection Act of 2013
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-04-10 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1867) |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to House Budget |
2013-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Budget, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Drug therapy
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
Budget deficits and national debt
Drug therapy
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1416/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1416/BILLS-113hr1416ih.pdf |