US HB1395 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-12-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 685.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Water Infrastructure Improvements for the Nation Act to reauthorize Delaware River Basin conservation programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Delaware River Basin Conservation Reauthorization Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] | Sen. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] |
Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA] | Sen. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Marcus Molinaro [R-NY] |
Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] | Rep. Pat Ryan [D-NY] | Rep. Thomas Kean [R-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] |
Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 685. |
2024-12-10 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2024-12-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-840, Part I. |
2024-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries Discharged |
2024-03-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Wildlife, and Fisheries. |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB654 (Same As) 2023-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 212.