US HB1362 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-16. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Became Public Law No: 115-16. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, the Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic. (Sec. 1) This bill designates the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, as the "Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic."
Title
To name the Department of Veterans Affairs community-based outpatient clinic in Pago Pago, American Samoa, the Faleomavaega Eni Fa'aua'a Hunkin VA Clinic.
Sponsors
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 127 (Y: 411 N: 2 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-16. (TXT | PDF) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1848) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-03-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 2 (Roll no. 127). (text: CR H1545-1546) |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1571) |
2017-03-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-03-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1362. |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1545-1547) |
2017-03-07 | House | Mrs. Radewagen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
American Samoa
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care
Armed forces and national security
Congressional tributes
Department of Veterans Affairs
Health facilities and institutions
Home and outpatient care
U.S. territories and protectorates
Veterans' medical care