US HB1328 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Heroes COLA Act of 2017 This bill requires that, whenever there is an increase in benefit amounts payable under title II (Old Age, Survivors and Disability Insurance) of the Social Security Act, the Department of Veterans Affairs shall increase by the same percentage the amounts payable as veterans' disability compensation, additional compensation for dependents, the clothing allowance for certain disabled adult children, and dependency and indemnity compensation for surviving spouses and children.
Title
American Heroes COLA Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Disability assistance
Inflation and prices
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1328/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1328/BILLS-115hr1328ih.pdf |