US HB1318 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Became Public Law No: 117-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To restrict the imposition by the Secretary of Homeland Security of fines, penalties, duties, or tariffs applicable only to coastwise voyages, or prohibit otherwise qualified non-United States citizens from serving as crew, on specified vessels transporting passengers between the State of Washington and the State of Alaska, to address a Canadian cruise ship ban and the extraordinary impacts of the COVID–19 pandemic on Alaskan communities, and for other purposes.
Title
Alaska Tourism Restoration Act
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-14. |
2021-05-24 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-05-24 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-05-20 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-20 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H2632) |
2021-05-20 | House | H.Amdt.50 On agreeing to the DeFazio amendment (A001) Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-20 | House | H.Amdt.50 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. DeFazio. (consideration: CR H2632-2633; text: CR H2632-2633) |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H2632-2633) |
2021-05-20 | House | Mr. DeFazio asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3186-3187) |
2021-05-20 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB593 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Held at the desk.