US HB1314 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 604.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-10-22 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 604.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Secretary of the Interior to enter into partnerships to develop housing, and for other purposes.
Title
LODGE Act Lodging Options Developed for Government Employees Act
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Moore [R-UT] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Rep. Mary Peltola [D-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-10-22 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 604. |
2024-10-22 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 118-712. |
2023-06-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-06-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-06-13 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2023-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2023-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |