US HB1311 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the State Department Basic Authorities Act of 1956 to provide for energy security and diplomacy, and for other purposes.
Title
Energy Diplomacy Act
Sponsors
Rep. August Pfluger [R-TX] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-30 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-30 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1157 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR403 (Similar To) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1311/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1311/BILLS-117hr1311ih.pdf |