US HB1307 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes a centralized location to publish information on disaster assistance provided by federal agencies. The Small Business Administration, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and any agencies providing disaster assistance must make available to the public on a quarterly basis information regarding (1) the total amount of assistance provided by the agency; (2) the amount provided that was expended or obligated; and (3) all projects or activities for which assistance was expended, obligated, or used.
Title
Post-Disaster Assistance Online Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7291-7292) |
2019-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1307. |
2019-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7291-7292) |
2019-07-24 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-07-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 127. |
2019-07-23 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2019-07-23 | House | Committee on Small Business discharged. |
2019-07-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-167, Part I. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, and Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Public-private cooperation
Emergency management
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Public-private cooperation