US HB1306 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the deadline by which the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) must (1) conduct a study and develop a plan under which the collection of information from disaster assistance applicants and grantees will be made less burdensome, duplicative, and time consuming for applicants and grantees; and (2) develop a plan for the regular collection and reporting of information on federal disaster assistance awarded. Not later than two years after enactment of this bill, FEMA shall convene a working group on a regular basis to (among other things) identify (1) potential areas of duplication or fragmentation in preliminary damage assessments after disaster declarations; and (2) potential emerging technologies, such as Unmanned Aircraft Systems (i.e., drones), to expedite the administration of preliminary damage assessments. FEMA must submit a comprehensive report on the plans for streamlining and consolidating information collection and preliminary damage assessments and the findings and recommendations of the working group to Congress with a briefing. The report must be made available to the public and posted on FEMA's website.
Title
Federal Disaster Assistance Coordination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA] |
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. David Rouzer [R-NC] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2019-10-28 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8485) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1306. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8484-8487) |
2019-10-28 | House | Mr. DeFazio moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 107. |
2019-07-11 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-145. |
2019-03-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-03-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-03-27 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations