US HB1302 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-09 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes within the Veterans Health Administration (VHA) of the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) the position of Director of Physician Assistant Services, who shall report to the VHA's Under Secretary for Health on all matters relating to the education and training, employment, appropriate utilization, and optimal participation of physician assistants within VHA programs and initiatives. Requires the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to ensure that an individual is serving in such position no later than 120 days after the enactment of this Act.
Title
To amend title 38, United States Code, to establish the position of Director of Physician Assistant Services within the office of the Under Secretary of Veterans Affairs for Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU] | Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] |
Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Henry Brown [R-SC] | Rep. Steve Buyer [R-IN] | Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Tim Holden [D-PA] |
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Rep. Ciro Rodriguez [D-TX] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-09 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-07-09 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-18 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-03-06 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. | |
2009-03-04 | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. | |
2009-03-04 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E548-549) |
Same As/Similar To
SB1155 (Same As) 2009-10-21 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health personnel
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1302/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1302/BILLS-111hr1302ih.pdf |