US HB1274 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 422.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State, Tribal, and Local Species Transparency and Recovery Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Endangered Species Act of 1973 to require the Department of the Interior or the Department of Commerce, as appropriate, to provide to affected states all data that is used as the basis of a determination on whether a species is an endangered species or a threatened species before making a determination. The appropriate department must: (1) use data submitted by a state, tribal, or county government in making such a determination; and (2) publish online the best scientific and commercial data available that are the basis for each listing determination unless public disclosure is prohibited by a state law relating to protection of personal information.
Title
State, Tribal, and Local Species Transparency and Recovery Act
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Gregg Harper [R-MS] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Sen. Roger Marshall [R-KS] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 422. |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-561. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 14. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-03-01 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E262) |
2017-03-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Environmental protection
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
State and local government operations
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection