US HB1260 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the limitation on the deduction for State and local taxes.
Title
SALT Relief Act
Sponsors
Rep. George Santos [R-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-02-28 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H954) |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H507)
HB680 (Related) 2023-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB830 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S827)
HB2660 (Related) 2023-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB680 (Related) 2023-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB830 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S827)
HB2660 (Related) 2023-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/1260/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr1260/BILLS-118hr1260ih.pdf |