US HB680 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-31 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the limitation on the deduction for State and local taxes.
Title
Tax Relief for Middle Class Families Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2023-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB339 (Related) 2023-01-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H507)
HB1260 (Related) 2023-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB830 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S827)
HB2660 (Related) 2023-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB5219 (Related) 2024-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1260 (Related) 2023-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB830 (Related) 2023-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S827)
HB2660 (Related) 2023-04-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB5219 (Related) 2024-09-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/680/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr680/BILLS-118hr680ih.pdf |