US HB1251 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
Pending: Senate Foreign Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes requirements related to diplomatic engagement with foreign countries on matters of U.S. cyberspace policy. Specifically, the bill establishes the Bureau of International Cyberspace Policy within the Department of State to advise the State Department on cyberspace issues and lead diplomatic efforts on issues related to international cybersecurity, internet access and freedom, and international cyber threats. The bureau must undertake specified duties and responsibilities to implement the stated U.S. policy of working internationally to promote an open, interoperable, and secure internet governed by a multi-stakeholder model that (1) promotes human rights, democracy, and rule of law; and (2) respects privacy and guards against deception, fraud, and theft. The President must devise a strategy for U.S. engagement with foreign governments on international norms related to responsible state behavior in cyberspace. Further, the President is encouraged to enter into executive arrangements with foreign governments that support U.S. cyberspace policy. In addition, annual country reports on human rights practices must include assessments of freedom of expression in each country with respect to electronic information, and the Government Accountability Office must report on U.S. diplomatic processes and other efforts with foreign countries to advance U.S. interests in cyberspace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cyber Diplomacy Act of 2021

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
2021-04-20HousePursuant to section 6 of H. Res. 330, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 367; H.R. 370; H.R. 396; H.R. 397, as amended; H.R. 408; H.R. 490; H.R. 965, as amended; H.R. 1251, as amended; H.R. 1395; H.R. 1491; H.R. 1528; H.R. 1532; H.R. 1565; H.R. 1602; and H.R. 2523, as amended; and the following resolution was agreed to under suspension of the rules: H. Res. 124, as amended. (consideration: CR H1979-1994; text: CR H1984-1988)
2021-04-20HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 330, proceedings on H.R. 1251 are considered vacated.
2021-04-19HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-04-19HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1251.
2021-04-19HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1930-1934; text: CR H1930-1933)
2021-04-19HouseMr. Meeks moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-02-25HouseOrdered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2021-02-25HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
2021-02-23HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR330 (Related) 2021-04-20 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects

Africa
Alliances
Argentina
Asia
Australia
Brazil
China
Collective security
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Due process and equal protection
Emergency planning and evacuation
Europe
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal officials
Foreign aid and international relief
France
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
India
Infrastructure development
Intellectual property
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Internet and video services
Israel
Japan
Kenya
Latin America
Middle East
North Korea
Oceania
Protest and dissent
Radio spectrum allocation
Religion
Right of privacy
Rule of law and government transparency
Sanctions
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Trade secrets and economic espionage
United Kingdom
Vietnam

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback