US HB1235 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation Moratorium Act of 2011 - Prohibits any federal department or agency from putting into force any rule until January 31, 2013, except a rule which involves U.S. military or foreign affairs functions or matters relating to agency management or personnel or to public property, loans, grants, benefits, or contracts or for which notice of proposed rulemaking is not otherwise required.
Title
Regulation Moratorium Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Sen. Jeff Flake [R-AZ] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Lynn Westmoreland [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Commercial and Administrative Law. |
2011-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Regulatory Affairs, Stimulus Oversight and Government Spending. |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1531 (Related) 2011-09-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1235/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1235/BILLS-112hr1235ih.pdf |