US HB1219 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-08 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2016 Authorizes the Department of the Interior to convey to the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District in Murray County, Oklahoma, all U.S. interest in the Maintenance Complex and District Office, Arbuckle Project, Oklahoma, consistent with the Agreement between the United States and the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District for Transferring Title to the Federally Owned Maintenance Complex and District Office to the Arbuckle Master Conservancy District. Provides that after such conveyance: (1) the Complex and Office shall not be considered to be a part of a federal reclamation project; and (2) such District shall not be eligible to receive any benefits with respect to any facility comprising that Complex and Office, except benefits that would be available to a similarly situated person with respect to such a facility that is not part of a federal reclamation project.
Title
Arbuckle Project Maintenance Complex and District Office Conveyance Act of 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 412 N: 1 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2016-12-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-12-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 1 (Roll no. 611). (text: CR 12/7/2016 H7208-7209) |
2016-12-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7301) |
2016-12-06 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2016-12-06 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1219. |
2016-12-06 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7208-7209) |
2016-12-06 | House | Mr. Bishop (UT) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-11-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 655. |
2016-11-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-834. |
2016-11-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-11-16 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2016-11-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-11-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-10-28 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-03-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Land transfers
Oklahoma
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply
Land transfers
Oklahoma
Public lands and natural resources
Water use and supply