US HB1182 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 73-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide benefits for noncitizen members of the Armed Forces, and for other purposes.
Title
Veteran Deportation Prevention and Reform Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Veterans' Affairs, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1183 (Related) 2022-03-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
SB3212 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8084)
HB7946 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB3212 (Related) 2021-11-15 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S8084)
HB7946 (Related) 2022-12-07 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1182/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1182/BILLS-117hr1182ih.pdf |