US HB1177 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-08 - Became Public Law No: 111-262.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
5-Star Generals Commemorative Coin Act - (Sec. 3) Requires the Secretary of the Treasury to mint and issue $5 gold coins, $1 silver coins, and half-dollar clad coins in recognition of five United States Army Five-Star Generals: George Marshall, Douglas MacArthur, Dwight Eisenhower, Henry "Hap" Arnold, and Omar Bradley, alumni of the United States Army Command and General Staff College, Fort Leavenworth, Kansas. (Sec. 4) Requires the design of the coins to include portraits of the generals. (Sec. 5) Restricts the issuance of such coins to calendar year 2013. (Sec. 7) Requires specified surcharges in the sale of such coins, which shall be paid promptly to the Command and General Staff College Foundation to help finance its support of the College.
Title
5-Star Generals Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-08 | Became Public Law No: 111-262. | |
2010-10-08 | Signed by President. | |
2010-09-30 | Presented to President. | |
2010-09-28 | Cleared for White House. | |
2010-09-28 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2010-09-28 | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. | |
2010-09-28 | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7656) | |
2010-05-24 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. | |
2010-05-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2010-05-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 5/19/2010 H3599-3600) | |
2010-05-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3682) | |
2010-05-19 | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Moore (KS) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn. | |
2010-05-19 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1177. | |
2010-05-19 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3604-3608) | |
2010-05-19 | Mr. Moore (KS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB455 (Related) 2009-02-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Higher education
Kansas
Military education and training
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Finance and financial sector
Higher education
Kansas
Military education and training
Military history
Military personnel and dependents
Teaching, teachers, curricula