US HB1175 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Act of 2015 This bill requires the Department of Commerce to: (1) establish a Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Fund to ensure that U.S. clean energy technology firms have the information and assistance they need to be competitive and to create clean energy technology sector jobs; and (2) administer the Fund to promote policies that will reduce production costs and encourage innovation, investment, and productivity in the clean energy technology sector, and implement a national clean energy technology export strategy. The Fund must be administered through the International Trade Administration. Clean energy technology includes technology related to the production, use, transmission, storage, control, or conservation of energy that will contribute to a stabilization of atmospheric greenhouse gas concentrations through reduction, avoidance, or sequestration of energy-related emissions and that will: (1) reduce the need for additional energy supplies by using existing supplies with greater efficiency or by transmitting, distributing, or transporting energy with greater effectiveness through U.S. infrastructure; or (2) diversify the sources of the energy supply to strengthen energy security and to increase supplies with a favorable balance of environmental effects if the entire technology system is considered. Commerce must provide information, tools, and other assistance to U.S. businesses to promote clean energy technology manufacturing and facilitate the export of clean energy technology products and services. This assistance must be consistent with the National Export Initiative.
Title
Clean Energy Technology Manufacturing and Export Assistance Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] | Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] |
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Mark Takai [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Terrorism, Nonproliferation, and Trade. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Power. |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1263 (Related) 2015-06-09 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Small business
Alternative and renewable resources
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental technology
Foreign trade and international finance
Government information and archives
Government trust funds
Manufacturing
Product development and innovation
Small business
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1175/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1175/BILLS-114hr1175ih.pdf |