US HB1162 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Water Recycling Investment and Improvement Act This bill makes permanent, and otherwise revises, the Bureau of Reclamation's grant program for the funding of water recycling and reuse projects. The bill removes priority under the program for projects in areas that, in the preceding four-year period, have been (1) identified as experiencing severe, extreme, or exceptional drought; or (2) designated as a disaster area by a state. Additionally, the bill increases the authorization of appropriations for the program and otherwise revises provisions related to program funding.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Recycling Investment and Improvement Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
2020-03-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-06-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-04HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2473 (Related) 2020-03-11 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 12.
HB4033 (Related) 2019-09-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
SB2466 (Related) 2019-09-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback