US HB1154 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 29 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-09-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the Department of the Interior to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating a study area comprised of cities and counties in Virginia and counties in North Carolina as a National Heritage Area to be known as the Great Dismal Swamp National Heritage Area. The study shall include analysis, documentation, and determinations on whether the study area (1) has an assemblage of natural, historic, and cultural resources that represent distinctive aspects of the people and culture of the United States; and (2) are worthy of recognition, conservation, interpretation, and continuing use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Great Dismal Swamp National Heritage Area Act Great Dismal Swamp National Heritage Area Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-28 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 391 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-29SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2021-09-28HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-09-28HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 391 - 36 (Roll no. 303). (text: CR 7/26/2021 H3860)
2021-09-28HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5496-5497)
2021-07-26HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-07-26HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1154.
2021-07-26HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3860-3861)
2021-07-26HouseMrs. Dingell moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-07-26HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 77.
2021-07-26HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-104.
2021-07-14HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
2021-07-14HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-07-14HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2021-06-15HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-03-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-02-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-02-18HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB803 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB470 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S899-900)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback